AR SB643 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB643 is now Act 973
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Absentee Ballots; And To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Absentee Ballots; And To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateNotification that SB643 is now Act 973
2021-04-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-21SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-20SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-20SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-20HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-19HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-04-13HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-13SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-12SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-04-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback