AR SB626 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Collection Of A Dna Sample From A Person Arrested For A Felony Offense; And Concerning Removal And Destruction Of A Dna Record And Dna Sample.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Collection Of A Dna Sample From A Person Arrested For A Felony Offense; And Concerning Removal And Destruction Of A Dna Record And Dna Sample.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-04-22SenateDied in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-03-24SenateWithdrawn by author.
2015-03-24SenateWithdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
2015-03-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-03SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2015-03-03SenateAmendment # 1 & #2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-03SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 & #2
2015-02-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback