AR SB623 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Remove A Driver's License Suspension Or Revocation As An Available Penalty For An Offense Not Related To Driving A Motor Vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Remove A Driver's License Suspension Or Revocation As An Available Penalty For An Offense Not Related To Driving A Motor Vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 19 N: 69 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-24SenateReturned From the House as Failed to Pass
2019-04-24HouseReturned to the Senate.
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-10HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-20SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback