AR SB623 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Remove A Driver's License Suspension Or Revocation As An Available Penalty For An Offense Not Related To Driving A Motor Vehicle.
Title
To Remove A Driver's License Suspension Or Revocation As An Available Penalty For An Offense Not Related To Driving A Motor Vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 19 N: 69 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Returned From the House as Failed to Pass |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-10 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed |