AR SB620 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Electioneering On Private Property Used As A Polling Place; To Amend The Law Concerning Polling Places; And To Amend The Law Concerning Electioneering.
Title
Concerning Electioneering On Private Property Used As A Polling Place; To Amend The Law Concerning Polling Places; And To Amend The Law Concerning Electioneering.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Filed |