AR SB616 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law To Prohibit Municipalities And Counties From Restricting The Use Of Auxiliary Containers.
Title
To Amend The Law To Prohibit Municipalities And Counties From Restricting The Use Of Auxiliary Containers.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R] | Rep. David Ray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb616&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R |
Text | ftp://arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB616/SB616033120210914.pdf |