AR SB615 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish That The Emergency Or Security Plan For A Public School Or Postsecondary Institution Is Exempt From The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish That The Emergency Or Security Plan For A Public School Or Postsecondary Institution Is Exempt From The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-04-22SenateDied on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-04-22HouseDied in House at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-03-31HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-03-30HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-30HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-30SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-30SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2015-03-30SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-30SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-30SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-30SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-30SenateAmendment #2 withdrawn
2015-03-30SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
2015-03-23SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-03-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-19SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-18SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2015-02-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
2015-02-25SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback