AR SB6 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Feb 28 in Room 171
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Protect Citizens Who Are Victims Of Judicial Ethics Violations; To Create A Cause Of Action Against Judges And Justices Who Have Been Convicted Of Certain Offenses; And To Create An Exception To Judicial Immunity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Protect Citizens Who Are Victims Of Judicial Ethics Violations; To Create A Cause Of Action Against Judges And Justices Who Have Been Convicted Of Certain Offenses; And To Create An Exception To Judicial Immunity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-09SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-09SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-09SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-09SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2017-02-01SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-01SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-01SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-01SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2017-01-19SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-19SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2016-11-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback