AR SB59 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB59 is now Act 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-02 - Notification that SB59 is now Act 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Arkansas State Claims Commission To Provide Specific Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law To Support A Final Adjudication For A Claim Considered By The Commission.
Title
To Require The Arkansas State Claims Commission To Provide Specific Findings Of Fact And Conclusions Of Law To Support A Final Adjudication For A Claim Considered By The Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Notification that SB59 is now Act 220 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-25 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-25 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2015-02-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Filed |