AR SB585 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB585 is now Act 839
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Create An Electronic Waste Recycling Program And A Collection Recovery Plan; And To Provide Sustainability Through Public Participation And Public And Private Agreements And Management And Accountability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create An Electronic Waste Recycling Program And A Collection Recovery Plan; And To Provide Sustainability Through Public Participation And Public And Private Agreements And Management And Accountability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateNotification that SB585 is now Act 839
2021-04-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-21SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-20SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-20SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-20HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-20HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-01HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-01HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-01SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-01SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-31SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-31SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-03-29SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-03-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback