AR SB560 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB560 is now Act 1023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB560 is now Act 1023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Be Known As The "arkansas Civil Asset Forfeiture Reform Act Of 2021".
Title
To Be Known As The "arkansas Civil Asset Forfeiture Reform Act Of 2021".
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Rep. Austin Mccollum [R] | Rep. Kendon Underwood [R] | Rep. Vivian Flowers [D] |
Rep. Jay Richardson [D] | Rep. Justin Gonzales [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB560 is now Act 1023 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-31 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Filed |