AR SB540 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Regulate Procurements For Water, Wastewater, And Storm Water Drainage Projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Regulate Procurements For Water, Wastewater, And Storm Water Drainage Projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - Senate - Motion to recall SB540 from the House FAILED (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-22SenateSine Die adjournment
2015-04-22SenateDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-04-22HouseDied in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2015-03-26SenateMotion to recall SB540 from the House FAILED
2015-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2015-03-25HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-25SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-25SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-18SenateEXPUNGED
2015-03-17SenateRead the third time and failed.
2015-03-16SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-16SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-16SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-12SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2015-02-24SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs
2015-02-24SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback