AR SB535 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB535 is now Act 1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB535 is now Act 1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Government Interaction With Nonprofit Entities Act.
Title
To Create The Government Interaction With Nonprofit Entities Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB535 is now Act 1021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass, Concur in House, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed, as amended #1 |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed |