AR SB513 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that SB513 is now Act 710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit Public Entities From Contracting With And Investing In Companies That Boycott Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit Public Entities From Contracting With And Investing In Companies That Boycott Israel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateNotification that SB513 is now Act 710
2017-03-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-03-23SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-03-22SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-03-22SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2017-03-22HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2017-03-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-03-13HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-03-13SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-03-13SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-09SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-03-08SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-03-08SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-08SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-03-06SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-03-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-02-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback