AR SB502 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Wholesale Distributors Of Controlled Substances To Educate, Communicate, And Provide Due Process For Licensed Professionals Before Limiting Or Terminating Sales Of Controlled Substances; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Require Wholesale Distributors Of Controlled Substances To Educate, Communicate, And Provide Due Process For Licensed Professionals Before Limiting Or Terminating Sales Of Controlled Substances; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Died in House at Sine Die Adjournment |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-04-03 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Filed |