AR SB5 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB5 is now Act 1391
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide Additional Funding For The Arkansas Forestry Commission And To Increase The Tax Levied Under The Forest Fire Protection Tax Act Of 1969.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide Additional Funding For The Arkansas Forestry Commission And To Increase The Tax Levied Under The Forest Fire Protection Tax Act Of 1969.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB5 is now Act 1391
2013-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-19HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2013-03-07HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-07SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2013-01-14SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback