AR SB484 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB484 is now Act 1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB484 is now Act 1019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Allocation Of Nonresident Income For Arkansas Income Tax Purposes; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Clarify The Allocation Of Nonresident Income For Arkansas Income Tax Purposes; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB484 is now Act 1019 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-27 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |