AR SB47 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-17 - Notification that SB47 is now Act 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-17 - Notification that SB47 is now Act 89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Arkansas Oil And Gas Commission To Form Brine Expansion Units Containing One Or More Brine Production Wells Or Brine Injection Wells And To Clarify The Annual Adjustment Of In-lieu Royalty Payments.
Title
To Authorize The Arkansas Oil And Gas Commission To Form Brine Expansion Units Containing One Or More Brine Production Wells Or Brine Injection Wells And To Clarify The Annual Adjustment Of In-lieu Royalty Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Notification that SB47 is now Act 89 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-02-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-02-06 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-02-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-01-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2015-01-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Filed |