AR SB463 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Notification that SB463 is now Act 787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Laws Regarding Abortion Reporting And Inspections Of Abortion Facilities; And To Require Certain Documentation Be Presented Before Performing An Abortion When The Pregnancy Is A Result Of Rape Or Incest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Laws Regarding Abortion Reporting And Inspections Of Abortion Facilities; And To Require Certain Documentation Be Presented Before Performing An Abortion When The Pregnancy Is A Result Of Rape Or Incest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateNotification that SB463 is now Act 787
2021-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-15SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-15HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-17SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-03SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-03SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback