AR SB463 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Initiatives And Referenda; And To Provide For The Licensing, Registration, And Enforcement Of Laws Concerning Certain Persons And Entities That Participate In The Paid Canvassing Industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Initiatives And Referenda; And To Provide For The Licensing, Registration, And Enforcement Of Laws Concerning Certain Persons And Entities That Participate In The Paid Canvassing Industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-08SenateThe vote by which SB463 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-04-08SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote
2019-04-08SenateClincher Motion Failed
2019-04-08SenateMotion for the Clincher
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-08SenateMotion for Immediate Consideration
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-03-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback