AR SB453 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Notification that SB453 is now Act 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Provide Funding For The Arkansas Waterways Commission And For The Development, Improvement, And Expansion Of River Transportation Resources Within The Mcclellan-kerr Arkansas River Navigation System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Provide Funding For The Arkansas Waterways Commission And For The Development, Improvement, And Expansion Of River Transportation Resources Within The Mcclellan-kerr Arkansas River Navigation System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateNotification that SB453 is now Act 561
2019-03-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-26SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-25SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-25SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-25SenateRules suspended.
2019-03-25SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-03-19SenateRe-referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-19SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-03-19HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-03-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-18HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-18HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-18HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-07HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-07SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-28SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback