AR SB444 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that SB444 is now Act 614
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act For The University Of Arkansas At Little Rock - Nanotechnology Center General Improvement Appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act For The University Of Arkansas At Little Rock - Nanotechnology Center General Improvement Appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-04SenateNotification that SB444 is now Act 614
2013-04-02SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-02SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-01SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-01SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-01HouseReturned To Senate as Passed.
2013-03-19HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-03-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-19HouseConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-03-19HouseRULES SUSPENDED
2013-03-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
2013-03-12HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-03-12SenateOrdered Immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-03-12SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2013-03-12SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-03-12SenateRules suspended.
2013-03-12SenateConsidered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
2013-03-07SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-02-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
2013-02-25SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback