AR SB44 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Notification that SB44 is now Act 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Notification that SB44 is now Act 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Arkansas Home Inspector Registration Board Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Arkansas Home Inspector Registration Board Appropriation For The 2019-2020 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Notification that SB44 is now Act 21 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-01-29 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2019-01-29 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-01-29 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-01-29 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2019-01-29 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2019-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2019-01-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Filed |