AR SB430 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that SB430 is now Act 983
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that SB430 is now Act 983
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Naming Of Public Facilities.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Naming Of Public Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Notification that SB430 is now Act 983 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed |