AR SB42 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that SB42 is now Act 472
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning Fitness To Proceed And Lack Of Criminal Responsibility; And Concerning A Mental Evaluation Of A Criminal Defendant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning Fitness To Proceed And Lack Of Criminal Responsibility; And Concerning A Mental Evaluation Of A Criminal Defendant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House of Representatives - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14SenateNotification that SB42 is now Act 472
2017-03-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-03-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-03-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-03-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-06SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 and #2 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2017-03-06SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-02-27SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2017-02-27HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2
2017-02-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-02-22HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-22HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-22HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-02-21HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2017-02-17HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-17HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-02-17HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-02-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-09HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-02-09SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-02-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-02-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-02-02SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-02SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-02-02SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-02-02SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2017-01-31SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-31SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-31SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-31SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-28SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback