AR SB408 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that SB408 is now Act 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Notification that SB408 is now Act 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Disclosure Requirements For Real Estate Transactions; To Require The Disclosure Of Agricultural Operations Near Real Property Located In A Rural Area.
Title
Concerning Disclosure Requirements For Real Estate Transactions; To Require The Disclosure Of Agricultural Operations Near Real Property Located In A Rural Area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Notification that SB408 is now Act 515 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2019-03-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |