AR SB407 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB407 is now Act 551
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Notification that SB407 is now Act 551
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require A School District Board Of Directors And Local Law Enforcement Agency To Adopt A Memorandum Of Understanding Governing School Resource Officers; And To Require School Resource Officers Complete Specialized Training.
Title
To Require A School District Board Of Directors And Local Law Enforcement Agency To Adopt A Memorandum Of Understanding Governing School Resource Officers; And To Require School Resource Officers Complete Specialized Training.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] | Rep. Jamie Scott [D] | Rep. Bruce Cozart [R] | Rep. Lee Johnson [R] |
Rep. Keith Slape [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Notification that SB407 is now Act 551 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |