AR SB368 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-7)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Notification that SB368 is now Act 893
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-7)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Notification that SB368 is now Act 893
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Comprehensive Statewide Workforce Development System; To Coordinate Various Workforce Development Programs; To Create An Office Of Skills Development; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Create A Comprehensive Statewide Workforce Development System; To Coordinate Various Workforce Development Programs; To Create An Office Of Skills Development; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Notification that SB368 is now Act 893 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-25 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-20 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-20 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-18 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 5 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-02-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Amendment # 2 AND #3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 withdrawn |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of Amendment |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Filed |