AR SB357 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Prohibit The Smoking Of Marijuana In Any Location In Arkansas.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Prohibit The Smoking Of Marijuana In Any Location In Arkansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - MOTION to EXPUNGE the vote by which SB 357 failed of adopted, FAILED. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-03-13 | Senate | MOTION to EXPUNGE the vote by which SB 357 failed of adopted, FAILED. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | The vote by which SB 357 FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |