AR SB35 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Senate Notification that SB35 is now Act 127
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Senate Notification that SB35 is now Act 127
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Office Of The Prosecutor Coordinator Appropriation For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Office Of The Prosecutor Coordinator Appropriation For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Senate Notification that SB35 is now Act 127 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-02-22 | House Returned To Senate as Passed. | |
2011-02-22 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-22 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-22 | House Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-02-22 | House RULES SUSPENDED | |
2011-02-21 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-21 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE | |
2011-02-21 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-01-13 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-01-13 | Senate Filed |