AR SB344 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB344 is now Act 439
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB344 is now Act 439
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Add An Exception From Nursing Licensure To Allow Employees Of A City Or County Detention Center To Draw And Measure Glucagon Or Insulin For A Person Who Is Incarcerated Or In Custody.
Title
To Add An Exception From Nursing Licensure To Allow Employees Of A City Or County Detention Center To Draw And Measure Glucagon Or Insulin For A Person Who Is Incarcerated Or In Custody.
Sponsors
Sen. Breanne Davis [R] | Rep. Joe Cloud [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Notification that SB344 is now Act 439 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-18 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-02 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed |