AR SB343 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Notification that SB343 is now Act 456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Arkansas Concurrent Challenge Scholarship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Arkansas Concurrent Challenge Scholarship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateNotification that SB343 is now Act 456
2019-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-12SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-11SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-11SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-11HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-07HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-02-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-02-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-02-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-02-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-02-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-26SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-26SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-26SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-26SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-02-20SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-20SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-02-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback