AR SB336 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that SB336 is now Act 1109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create An Exemption From The Sales And Use Tax For Coins, Currency, And Bullion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create An Exemption From The Sales And Use Tax For Coins, Currency, And Bullion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateNotification that SB336 is now Act 1109
2021-04-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-27SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-27HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2021-04-21HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-21SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-21SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-20SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-20SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-19SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-02-22SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2021-02-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb336&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB336/SB336022220211038.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB336/SB336042020211340.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1109.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB336-S1.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/SB336-DFA1.pdf
Supplementftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/FiscalImpact/2021R/Public/SB336-DFA2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB336&rcs=2966&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB336&rcs=3157&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback