AR SB336 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that SB336 is now Act 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Notification that SB336 is now Act 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Law Regarding The Sale, Lease, Purchasing, And Disposal Of Real And Personal Property Of Municipalities.
Title
To Clarify The Law Regarding The Sale, Lease, Purchasing, And Disposal Of Real And Personal Property Of Municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Notification that SB336 is now Act 470 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Filed |