AR SB331 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Notification that SB331 is now Act 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Notification that SB331 is now Act 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Freedom Of Participation In Interscholastic Sports In Arkansas; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Allow Freedom Of Participation In Interscholastic Sports In Arkansas; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] | Rep. Julie Mayberry [R] | Sen. Cecile Bledsoe [R] | Rep. Andy Davis [R] |
Rep. Grant Hodges [R] | Rep. Justin Harris [R] | Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R] | Rep. Rebecca Petty [R] |
Rep. Richard Womack [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Notification that SB331 is now Act 562 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-17 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed |