AR SB324 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that SB324 is now Act 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Notification that SB324 is now Act 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The University Of Arkansas Community College At Batesville Supplemental Appropriation.
Title
An Act For The University Of Arkansas Community College At Batesville Supplemental Appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Notification that SB324 is now Act 299 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-03 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2021-03-03 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-03 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2021-03-03 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-02-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-02-24 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed |