AR SB313 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring The Parole Board To Issue And Release Findings Of Fact When It Denies Parole Or Transfer To A Person Otherwise Eligible For Release On Parole Or Transfer From The Department Of Correction.
Title
Requiring The Parole Board To Issue And Release Findings Of Fact When It Denies Parole Or Transfer To A Person Otherwise Eligible For Release On Parole Or Transfer From The Department Of Correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-04-05 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed |