AR SB311 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Notification that SB311 is now Act 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Notification that SB311 is now Act 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Permit A Prosecuting Attorney Or A Deputy Prosecuting Attorney To Have His Or Her Post Office Box Listed As His Or Her Address On His Or Her Driver's License.
Title
To Permit A Prosecuting Attorney Or A Deputy Prosecuting Attorney To Have His Or Her Post Office Box Listed As His Or Her Address On His Or Her Driver's License.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Notification that SB311 is now Act 397 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-03-11 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-18 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-18 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed |