AR SB311 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Notification that SB311 is now Act 559
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Notification that SB311 is now Act 559
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize A Statewide Parcel Mapping Grant Program And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
An Act To Authorize A Statewide Parcel Mapping Grant Program And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Senate Notification that SB311 is now Act 559 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-17 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-17 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-07 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-23 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE | |
2011-02-23 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-23 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Filed |