AR SB31 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Notification that SB31 is now Act 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Notification that SB31 is now Act 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Components Of A College And Career Readiness Assessment.
Title
To Amend The Components Of A College And Career Readiness Assessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Notification that SB31 is now Act 319 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-02-25 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2020-12-31 | Senate | Filed |