AR SB31 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that SB31 is now Act 315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Notification that SB31 is now Act 315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship; And To Expand Eligibility As A Traditional Student.
Title
Concerning The Arkansas Academic Challenge Scholarship; And To Expand Eligibility As A Traditional Student.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Notification that SB31 is now Act 315 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-22 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-02-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-02-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-02-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 and 2 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Filed |