AR SB31 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-01 - Senate Notification that SB31 is now Act 7
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-01 - Senate Notification that SB31 is now Act 7
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Office Of The Governor - Emergency Proclamation Appropriation For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Office Of The Governor - Emergency Proclamation Appropriation For The 2011-2012 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | Senate Notification that SB31 is now Act 7 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-01-31 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-01-31 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-01-31 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-01-31 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-01-27 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2011-01-27 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-01-27 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-01-13 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee | |
2011-01-13 | Senate Filed |