AR SB305 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB305 is now Act 440
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Notification that SB305 is now Act 440
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Award Procedure For Public Improvement Contracts.
Title
To Amend The Award Procedure For Public Improvement Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 6 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Notification that SB305 is now Act 440 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-03-15 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |