AR SB300 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB300 is now Act 946
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting Parole For A Person Convicted Of The Offense Of Possession Of A Firearm By Certain Persons Under Certain Circumstances; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting Parole For A Person Convicted Of The Offense Of Possession Of A Firearm By Certain Persons Under Certain Circumstances; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateNotification that SB300 is now Act 946
2021-04-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-23SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-22SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-22SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-04-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-22SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-22SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-21SenateReturned from the House as passed, as amended, Amendment # 1.
2021-04-21HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-04-21HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-04-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-21HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-03-29HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-29HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-29SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-29SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2021-03-29SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-18SenateAmendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-18SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
2021-03-15SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-15SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-15SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-15SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2021-03-03SenateRe-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-03SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb300&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB300/SB300020820211304.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB300/SB300030320210932.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB300/SB300031520211047.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB300/SB300031820210922.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB300/SB300042120211012.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=946.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB300-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB300-S2.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB300-S3.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB300-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB300&rcs=2462&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB300&rcs=3045&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB300&rcs=3027&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback