AR SB3 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Notification that SB3 is now Act 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require Additional Reporting Requirements By Certain Physicians And Healthcare Facilities For Abortion Complications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require Additional Reporting Requirements By Certain Physicians And Healthcare Facilities For Abortion Complications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateNotification that SB3 is now Act 620
2019-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-03-28SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-03-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-03-27SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-03-27HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-03-27HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-07HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-07SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-07SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-06SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-02-28SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-28SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-28SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-28SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2019-02-19SenateRe-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-02-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-02-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-02-19SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2019-01-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2018-11-15SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback