AR SB3 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-01-23 - Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate State Agencies & Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit Elected Public Officials From Registering As Lobbyists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit Elected Public Officials From Registering As Lobbyists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-23SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-01-23SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-23SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-23SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2017-01-19SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-01-19SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-19SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-01-19SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2017-01-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2016-11-18SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback