AR SB298 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House failing to act on override of Governor's veto.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Be Known As The "arkansas Sovereignty Act Of 2021"; Concerning The Right To Bear Arms In The State Of Arkansas; And Concerning Other Constitutional Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Be Known As The "arkansas Sovereignty Act Of 2021"; Concerning The Right To Bear Arms In The State Of Arkansas; And Concerning Other Constitutional Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Override of the Governor's Veto of SB298. The override of the Governor's Veto passed. (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Motion to reconsider passage of SB298 notwithstanding the Veto of the Governor. (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15SenateDied in House failing to act on override of Governor's veto.
2021-10-15HouseDied in House at Sine Die Adjournment
2021-04-27HouseMotion to postpone vote of override of veto passed
2021-04-27HousePrivilege matter to override executive veto
2021-04-26HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-26SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House for consideration to override the Governor's Veto.
2021-04-26SenateOverride of the Governor's Veto of SB298. The override of the Governor's Veto passed.
2021-04-26SenateMotion passed.
2021-04-26SenateMotion to reconsider passage of SB298 notwithstanding the Veto of the Governor.
2021-04-26SenateSB298 was Vetoed by the Governor.
2021-04-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-19SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-15SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-15SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-15HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-03-31HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-03-31HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-03-31SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-03-31SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-03-30SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-03-17SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-03-17SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-03-17SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-03-17SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2021-02-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-02-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb298&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB298/SB298020820211301.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB298/SB298031720210954.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB298-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB298&rcs=2518&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB298&rcs=2892&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB298&rcs=3123&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB298&rcs=3124&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback