AR SB295 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB295 is now Act 1127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB295 is now Act 1127
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Revenue Stabilization Law; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Notification that SB295 is now Act 1127 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-04-03 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-04-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-31 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2017-03-31 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The vote by which the emergency clause for SB 295 FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |