AR SB294 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Notification that SB294 is now Act 539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Notification that SB294 is now Act 539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Sentencing Of A Person Under Eighteen Years Of Age; To Declare An Emergency; And Establishing The Fair Sentencing Of Minors Act Of 2017.
Title
Concerning The Sentencing Of A Person Under Eighteen Years Of Age; To Declare An Emergency; And Establishing The Fair Sentencing Of Minors Act Of 2017.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Notification that SB294 is now Act 539 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-14 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-02-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The vote by which the emergency clause FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |