AR SB291 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal The Requirement For The Use Of Certain Aftermarket Crash Parts In Repair Of A Vehicle.
Title
To Repeal The Requirement For The Use Of Certain Aftermarket Crash Parts In Repair Of A Vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2017-02-27 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2017-02-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2017-02-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |